judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MOZIE E. MILLER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0835
Short Caption:MOZIE E. MILLER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-22279-09Filed Date:07/07/2010

Opening Event Date:07/07/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/28/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/08/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMozie Miller YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/07/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
07/21/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (138 pgs/Ronan) 6/7-8/10 proc.
07/22/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 6/21/10 proc. w/cd
07/28/2010RECORD COPIES
07/28/2010RECORD INDEX
07/28/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (ord sealing bench conference--Judge Bayly filed 12/15/09)
07/28/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/30/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/08/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
09/16/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before December 7, 2010. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
12/07/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
12/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 7, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
03/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
03/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 6, 2011. No further re quests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause.(ETW)
06/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
06/15/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, and it appearing that this court issued the briefingorder on July 30, 2010, and that counsel has repeatedly filed motions for extensions of time, it is ORDERED that the motionis granted to the extent that appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed by August 30, 2011, or counsel shall show cause why he should not be held in contempt for failure to comply with this court's order. (ETW)
08/30/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledAppendix (Attached to Brief) (Appellant)
09/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief to October 31, 2011 (Appellee)
10/03/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief to 10/31/11
10/31/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until November 7, 2011 (Appellee)
11/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for extension and to file lodged brief of appellee.
11/09/2011FiledBriefing Completed
11/09/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
01/05/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/02/2012FiledMotion Requesting Argument (Appellant)Granted
02/09/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for oral argument.
02/17/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte setting argument time back.
02/28/2012FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/01/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
03/01/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/08/2012FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judge Fisher, Steadman
03/20/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
03/27/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/11/2012FiledMandate