judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD EUGENE McDANIEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-283)
Case Number:06-283Case Docketed On:12/12/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Wyoming Rules of Criminal Procedure
Short Title:DONALD EUGENE McDANIEL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD EUGENE McDANIEL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Eugene McDaniel Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 125
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/12/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/12/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/12/2006Order - Granting in forma pauperisOrderGranting in forma pauperisFinal
12/12/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/26/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/01/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/02/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appelleeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/09/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/12/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - BRVNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
03/28/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/04/2007Order - Assignment of judge - Steven Cranfill, District Judge for Chief Justice VoigtOrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
04/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, original Supreme Court Case No. 96-323.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/03/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. District Judge Cranfill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/21/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/21/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/24/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal