judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILSON (BRIAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34738
Short Caption:WILSON (BRIAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42739 , 43798
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C107684Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/03/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08040
08/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal. 99-08079
10/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34688, 34691, 34693, 34706, 34715, 34716, 34738. 99-09633
01/03/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 12/30/99. 00-00012
01/03/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-11402
07/31/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-11593
07/31/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 20, 2001. 01-11593