Case: 03-0795
03-0795
08/28/2003
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
IN RE SHAWN ERIC MCGEE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/28/2003 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to petition for review on behalf of Shawn Eric McGee (printed off web) | |
08/28/2003 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for review filed on behalf of Shawn Eric McGee, orig and 3 per AW (also includes COA case # 05-03-01037-CV | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/15/2004 | Case Stored | G02/26-B-1 | | |
01/08/2004 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent to the court of appeals. | | |
11/21/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
11/21/2003 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Denied | Mot for free statement of facts(record) to include all exhibits from 5th CO & 330th DC of Dallas Court denied | |
10/21/2003 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
09/08/2003 | Document received (See Remarks) | petitioner Shawn Eric McGee's Response | | |
08/28/2003 | Miscellaneous Motion | Mot for free statement of facts(record) to include all exhibits from 5th CO & 330th DC of Dallas Co., filed on behalf of Shawn McGee (incorp. into pet) | | |
08/28/2003 | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | Aff of inability to pay filed on behalf of Shawn Eric McGee incorporated into pet for review | | |
08/28/2003 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to petition for review on behalf of Shawn Eric McGee (printed off web) | | |
08/28/2003 | Petition for Review | Petition for review filed on behalf of Shawn Eric McGee, orig and 3 per AW (also includes COA case # 05-03-01037-CV | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/15/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/26-B-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MCGEE, SHAWN ERIC | Petitioner | Shawn McGee |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-03-01038-CV
Denied
___ SW3d ___, 07-28-03
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable JOSEPH B. MORRIS
Trial Court Information
330th District Court
Dallas
02-07851Y