judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEAVER (ROBERT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34744
Short Caption:WEAVER (ROBERT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Lyon Co. - Third Judicial District - CR5120Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08071
09/08/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Wayne Pederson shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-08450
09/21/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certificate of Compliance of Request for Transcripts. 99-08965
10/13/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-09928
11/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11389
11/17/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.