judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM L. BARNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-286)
Case Number:06-286Case Docketed On:12/14/2006
Linked To: 06-285
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:WILLIAM L. BARNES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM L. BARNES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam L. BarnesDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
David James Willms
Kristen Adell Wendt

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2008 WY 6
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/14/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/20/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - received amended notice of appeal and call from public defender. A conditional guilty plea was entered, but not reflected in the judgment and sentence.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/30/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/31/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/16/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
03/19/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/02/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant - thirdMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/02/2007Order - Grant - third extension of time - no furtherOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
05/25/2007Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
05/25/2007Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
06/04/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/19/2007Record - Supplemental record on appeal (order granting Appellant's motion). Supplement attached to motionRecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
07/17/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/15/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential File (for both appeals)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/31/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kristen Dolan for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/19/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Terry Armitage, Deputy Attorney General and Kristen Adell Dolan, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Dolan for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/19/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/23/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/12/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/11/08 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal