judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

O.L.D., INC. V. DREYFUS-KCP-2001, LLC, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0841
Short Caption:O.L.D., INC. V. DREYFUS-KCP-2001, LLC, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6976-07Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/13/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/19/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/19/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantO.L.D. Inc.N
Barton D. Moorstein YN
AppelleeDreyfus-Kcp-2001 LLc.N
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeKoin 2001 LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeBenenson Capital 2001 Penn LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeBenenson Mukwonage Penn LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeBenenson Chester Penn LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeBenenson Associates 2001 Penn LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN
AppelleeLouk 2001 LLCN
Robert E. Greenberg YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/20/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 6, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/09/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 11/16/09 & 11/17/09) (elp)
08/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (300-pgs/ronan 11/16-17/09 proc.)w/cd attached
08/13/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/16/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
08/18/2010RECORD INDEX
08/23/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (pleadings filed in superior court)
09/27/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/27/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
10/20/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 11/19/10 (consent)
10/21/2010 On consideration of appellees' motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before November 19, 2010. (JAC) elp
11/19/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/19/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
02/02/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of April 2011 through June 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by FEB. 14, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
02/11/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aplt
02/15/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
04/19/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/2011FiledARGUED before Washington,Reid,Wagner. Barton D.Moorstein Esq.,for appellant. Robert E.Greenberg Esq.,for appellee.
09/15/2011FiledRemanded (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge; Reid, Associate Judge, Retired; and Wagner, Senior Judge)
10/07/2011FiledMandate