Case: 08-03-00398-CR
08-03-00398-CR
08/27/2003
Delivery of Cocaine
Richard Subia
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/03/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/29/2004 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
01/29/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||
01/26/2004 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |||
11/24/2003 | Miscellaneous filing | | |||
11/19/2003 | Reporter/Recorders Record received | | |||
08/27/2003 | NOA not in compliance - notice | | |||
08/27/2003 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/03/2004 | Case Stored | Court has determined no historical value - file to be destroyed once retention schedule has been met |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Subia, Richard | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Robert V. Garcia Jr. |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. John W. Smith |
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
Honorable Tryon D. Lewis
B-28,880
8 yrs IDTDCJ