Case: 14-09-00845-CR
14-09-00845-CR
10/06/2009
Murder
Misti Lea Thompson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
04/09/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/25/2012 | Case stored | | |||||
11/01/2011 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
10/27/2011 | Mandate due to be issued | | |||||
07/27/2011 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | REFUSED | | ||||
06/10/2011 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||
04/07/2011 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||
04/07/2011 | Petition for discretionary review due | | |||||
03/23/2011 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |||||
03/23/2011 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
03/08/2011 | Memorandum opinion issued | AFFIRMED |
| ||||
10/20/2010 | Submitted | | |||||
09/10/2010 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
07/09/2010 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
07/09/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
07/09/2010 | State brief due | | |||||
06/11/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
06/10/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
06/10/2010 | State brief due | | |||||
05/11/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
05/10/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
05/10/2010 | State brief due | | |||||
04/16/2010 | Response due | | |||||
04/09/2010 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
04/09/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
04/09/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
04/06/2010 | Notice of late brief | | |||||
04/02/2010 | Appellants brief due | | |||||
03/11/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
03/03/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
02/03/2010 | Reporters record due | | |||||
02/01/2010 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
01/19/2010 | No reporters record filed in criminal case | | |||||
01/15/2010 | Reporters record due | | |||||
12/02/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED | | ||||
12/01/2009 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||
11/16/2009 | Reporters record due | | |||||
11/16/2009 | Record due | | |||||
11/12/2009 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
10/06/2009 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested | | |||||
10/06/2009 | Court reporters information sheet sent | | |||||
10/06/2009 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
09/17/2009 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
09/17/2009 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/25/2012 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
11/01/2011 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Jessica Alane Caird |
THOMPSON, MISTI LEA | Criminal - Appellant | Kyle Johnson |
Trial Court Information
208th District Court
Harris
Honorable Denise Collins
1154575
37 YEARS TDC