judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

A. G. BEDNER v. DUNIGAN TOOL AND SUPPLY COMPANY

Case: A-46
A-46
01/25/1944
Application for Writ of Error
A. G. BEDNER
DUNIGAN TOOL AND SUPPLY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/12/1944Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
05/18/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/15/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/08/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
03/08/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/25/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/24/1944Letter Filed
06/12/1944Brief in Support of Petition
05/18/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/15/1944Reply to Response
03/08/1944Response to Petition
03/08/1944Supplemental Brief filed
02/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
01/25/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/25/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dunigan Tool and Supply CompanyRespondent
A. G. BednerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information