Case Information: 34743 | |||
Short Caption: | PORTEOUS VS. PORTEOUS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 24233 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 09/03/1999 / Morgan, Ann | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/27/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Woodburn and Wedge--check no. 53957 ($100) and no. 53971 ($100). | ||
08/27/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-08069 | |
09/02/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 09/28/98 & 10/02/98 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Lola L. Sharp. | 99-08244 | |
09/03/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ann Morgan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/08/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-08451 | |
10/06/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 99-09581 | |
10/06/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal with Prejudice. | 99-09583 | |
10/29/1999 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." SNP/CLK | 99-10603 | |
10/29/1999 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
11/08/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion. | 99-11009 |