judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

F. PATRICIA CALLAHAN V. 515 DC, LLC, ET AL.,

Case Information: 10-CV-0840
Short Caption:F. PATRICIA CALLAHAN V. 515 DC, LLC, ET AL.,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3971-08Filed Date:07/06/2010

Opening Event Date:07/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/19/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:03/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/30/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/07/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantF. Patricia Callahan NPro SeN
Appellee4200 Cathedral Condominium UnitN
John E. Scheuermann YN
AppelleeZiab Kabanni N
Eric SaylesNY
Seth P. SlomovitzYY
Appellee515 DC LLCN
Eric SaylesNY
Seth P. SlomovitzYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 6, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/02/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 1/26/10 & 1/27/10) (elp)
09/03/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (515 D.C., LLC, Ziad Kabbani, 4200 Cathedral Condominium)
09/14/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED 1/26/10 & 1/27/10) (elp)
09/14/2010APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to aple's joint motion to dismiss appeal for failure to comply with the July 16, 2010 order
09/15/2010APPELLEE'S REPLY-to oppo of aplt to joint motion to dismiss appeal for failure to comply with the 7/16/10 order (515 DC, LLC & Kiad Kabbani, 4200 Cathedral Condo.)
09/24/2010RECEIVED - motion for leave to file sur-reply (did not comply w/rule 27)
10/05/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file sur-reply.
10/05/2010RECEIVED - sur-reply to aple's reply to oppo to motion to dismiss.
10/27/2010 On consideration of appellee's joint motion to dismiss appeal, the opposition, and reply thereto, and appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged sur-reply, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that appellee Stewart Title Group is no longer a party to this appeal, it is ORDERED, sua sponte, that the case caption is amended as shown above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's motion for leave is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged sur-reply. It is (MORE)
10/27/2010APPELLANT'S SUR-REPLY
10/27/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that appellees' motion to dismiss is denied. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(C). It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, the record index and transcripts required by D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) elp
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD# 1 (118-pgs/jeon 1/26/10 proc)
11/19/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (71-pgs/graybill 1/27/10 proc.)w/cd
11/19/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/29/2010RECORD INDEX
01/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
01/03/2011APPENDIX
01/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (515 DC, LLC,Ziad Kabbani & 4200 Cathedral Conds and to permit filing of supplemental appendix to 3/4/11
02/01/2011 On consideration of appellees' joint motion for an extension of time within which to file the briefs and a supplemental appendix, ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' briefs and the supplemental appendix shall be filed on or before March 4, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (4200 Cathedral)
03/04/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (515 DC, LLC & Ziab Kabbani)
03/04/2011APPENDIX aple
03/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
05/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
06/30/2011SUBMITTED before Chief Judge Washington, Fisher, Farrell
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (14-pgs/graybill 1/28/10 proc.)
07/06/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (14-pgs/graybill 1/29/10 proc.)w/cd
07/20/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/04/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing (Appellant)
09/02/2011FiledOrder Denying appellant's pro se petition for rehearing
09/07/2011FiledMandate
09/23/2011FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate and grant stay (Appellant)
09/26/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE/OPPO/REPLY
09/28/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion to rescind mandate and grant a stay (Appellee 515 DC LLC & Ziad Kabbani)
10/05/2011FiledReply to oppo to aplt's motion to rescind mandate and grant stay (Appellant)
10/26/2011FiledORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE
12/08/2011FiledCopy/Notice Of Petition For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
02/28/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)
04/19/2012FiledNotice Of Denial Of Pet. For Writ Of Certiorari (Appellant)