Case: 09-0928
09-0928
11/06/2009
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
BRETT ARNOLD AND PATRICIA RUDDER
B.R. ISRAEL
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/22/2010 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | PET's appendix (12) filed on behalf of Brett Arnold and Patricia Rudder. | |
01/22/2010 | Redrafted Petition for Review | Petitioner | PET's redrafted petition for review (15) filed on behalf of Brett Arnold and Patricia Rudder. | |
12/04/2009 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | PFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Patricia Rudder. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/2010 | Notice from attorney regarding vacation dates | Respondent's counsel, Mr. J. Kevin Clark, Vacation Notice. He will be on vacation from Nov 17 - 22, 2010. (1) | | |
05/26/2010 | Case Stored | G02 Row 17 E-2 | | |
05/24/2010 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Certified copy of notice sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
04/09/2010 | Petition for Review disposed | Dismissed for Want of Jurisdiction | | |
02/23/2010 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
01/28/2010 | Correction filed (See Remarks) | Correction to Appendix to Pet/Rev (TC Order & COA Opinion). On behalf of Brett Arnold, et al. (12) | | |
01/25/2010 | Call received | From Ms. Patricia Rudder to inform the Court that she will be over nighting the appendix to her petition to be here by Friday, Jan. 29, 2010. | | |
01/25/2010 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Left msg. w/ Ms. Rudder letting her know that she is missing the COA opinion/judgment and TC order in her appendix. Msg also stated that the petition will be struck if the amended appendix is not here by Friday, January 29, 2010. | | |
01/22/2010 | Document filed (see remarks) | PET's "Appellants' Brief" from 2nd COA (11) filed on behalf of Patricia Rudder. | | |
01/22/2010 | Appendix Filed | PET's appendix (12) filed on behalf of Brett Arnold and Patricia Rudder. | | |
01/22/2010 | Redrafted Petition for Review | PET's redrafted petition for review (15) filed on behalf of Brett Arnold and Patricia Rudder. | | |
01/05/2010 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | M/e/t to file redrafted pet/rev is granted. Redrafted pet/rev is due January 22, 2010. further reqs will be disfavored. | |
12/23/2009 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | To resp atty. (spoke to Donna, paralegal to Mr. Clark) to inquire whether they're opposed or unopposed to m/e/t to file redrawn pet. They are opposed but don't know whether they will be filing a response because they've never gotten a copy of the petition, but they did get a copy of the m/e/t. | | |
12/23/2009 | Motion for Extension of Time filed | M/E/T to file Pet's redrafted pet/rev. On behalf of Brett Arnold, et al. (3) | | |
12/21/2009 | Call received | From Ms. Rudder letting the Court know that she will be submitting a motion to extend time to file her redrafted pet/rev. She should only needs a few days to submit the redraft (it should be here before Christmas or shortly there after). | | |
12/14/2009 | Letter Filed | Resp's letter to inform the Court that they are unable to determine whether to file a response or waiver to pet/rev bcs they have not been served. On behalf of B.R. Israel. (3) | | |
12/11/2009 | Petition for Review disposed | Filed document is struck by the Court | Struck pursuant to TRAP 9.3(b), 9.4(d), 9.5, 53.2(a), (k); redrafted petition due 12/21/09 | |
12/08/2009 | Call received | From Ms. Patricia Rudder to inform the Court that her copies of the pet and the appendix will be coming in. | | |
12/04/2009 | Petition for Review | PFR appendix attached (12) filed on behalf of Patricia Rudder. | | |
11/20/2009 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted. Petition due 12/2/09. | |
11/19/2009 | Call received | Call returned; rsp atty Kevin Clark will not file a response unless Court requests. | | |
11/19/2009 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Call made to J. Kevin Clark to find out if a response to the 53.7(f) will be filed; left message | | |
11/06/2009 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | S/W Mr. Clark's legal assistant Donna. She said that they are opposed to the motion, but she is not sure if he will be filing a response. She said that he is out of town on vaction and will not be returing until Tuesday. I told her that I would give her a call back on Tuesday to see if a response is forthcoming. | | |
11/06/2009 | Notice requesting filing fee | Sent to Patricia Rudder for $10 filing fee for 53.7 | ||
11/06/2009 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | M/e/t to file petition for review. On behalf of Brett Arnold and Patricia A. Rudder. (3) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/26/2010 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 17 E-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Israel, B. R. | Respondent | Mr. J. Kevin Clark |
Arnold, Brett | Petitioner | Ms. Patricia Anne Rudder |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-08-00281-CV
Dismiss WOP
___ SW3d ___, 08-26-09
2nd Court of Appeals
Honorable Per Curiam
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Tarrant
Honorable Jennifer Setser Rymell
08-63080-2