Case: 06-0996
06-0996
11/14/2006
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
IN THE INTEREST OF S.A.S. AND M.I.S.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/14/2006 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | |
12/14/2006 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for review filed on behalf of Angela Ann Schiveley. (12) | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/16/2007 | Case Stored | G02 Row 7 F-2 | | |
03/16/2007 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final Order sent to the Court of Appeals | | |
01/03/2007 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
12/21/2006 | Response Waiver filed | On behalf of Texas Department of Protective and Regulatory Services. (12) | | |
12/14/2006 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached to pet/rev. | | |
12/14/2006 | Petition for Review | Petition for review filed on behalf of Angela Ann Schiveley. (12) | | |
11/16/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Pet's m/e/t to file petition for review granted. Petition for review due n/l/t 5:00 p.m. on 12/12/06. | |
11/14/2006 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf of Angela Schiveley. M/e/t to file pet/rev. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/16/2007 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02 Row 7 F-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Firby, Michelle | Other interested party | Ms. Michelle Firby |
Schiveley, Angela Ann | Petitioner | Ms. Stephanie J. Hall Ms. Lynn Tuttle Coleman |
Texas Department of Family and Protective Services | Respondent | Ms. Adrienne Marie Livsey Ms. Suzanne Laechelin Mr. David K. Walker |
Schiveley, Frederick William | Other interested party | Mr. Robert Allen Rosenquist |
S.A.S. and M.I.S. | Other interested party | Ms. Ruth L. Vernier |
Court of Appeals Information:
09-05-00451-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 1]
___ SW3d___, 08-24-06
9th Court of Appeals
Honorable Hollis Horton
Trial Court Information
284th District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Van C. Stovall
04-03-02411-CV