judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HILL (RICKIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34740
Short Caption:HILL (RICKIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C152805Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/17/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08041
10/19/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 99-10124
10/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10623
10/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10624
11/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. 99-10964
11/15/1999MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Amended Fast Track Statement and Appendix. 99-11216
11/30/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The state's motion to strike the fast track statement and appendix is granted. The clerk shall strike the fast track statement and appendix filed on October 29, 1999. Counsel for appellant's motion to withdraw is denied. Counsel for appellant shall, within 5 days from the date of this order, file a transcript request form or certificate that no transcript is required and shall file and serve a fast track statement and appendix within 20 days of this order, or show cause why counsel should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C. 99-11910
12/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-13034
12/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Amended Appendix. 99-13035
12/23/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: January 19, 1999 and January 21, 1999. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 99-13076
12/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney. 99-13142
01/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. On December 27, 1999, appellant's counsel, Chad M. Golightly, filed with this court a motion to withdraw as attorney of record. Mr. Golightly has fulfilled all of his responsibilities as trial and appellate counsel, including the filing of the fast track statement and the rough draft transcript request. For that reason, we grant Mr. Golightly's motion to withdraw. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall: (1) transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order; and (2) serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days within which to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. After the new counsel's appointment or appearance as attorney of record for appellant, new counsel shall, in accordance with NRAP 3C(g), have 20 days in which to file with this court a supplemental fast track statement that may raise material issues not raised in the fast track statement. Finally, pursuant to NRAP 3C(b)(1), Mr. Golightly's permission with withdraw is conditioned upon his agreement to fully cooperate with new appellate counsel during this appeal. 00-00168
01/12/2000Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 00-00522
01/12/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 00-00523
01/31/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. District Court Order Appointing Counsel filed January 27, 2000. Christopher R. Oram appointed as counsel. 00-01515
02/04/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Christopher R. Oram appointed on January 18, 2000, as counsel for appellant. 00-01804
02/29/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. 00-03173
05/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We have determined that the rough draft transcripts previously provided to this court are not sufficient to resolve the issues raised in this appeal. Appellant's counsel shall file and serve a request for the full transcript of the trial and the Petrocelli hearing conducted on January 12, 1999 pursuant to NRAP (9a). Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-08552
06/29/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: July 29, 2000. 00-11098
08/02/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 8/1/00. STRICKEN BY ORDER 10/23/00. 00-13350
08/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. To date appellant's counsel has not complied with our May 22, 2000, order. Appellant's counsel shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the full transcripts of the trial and Petrocelli hearing conducted on January 12, 2000, or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. 00-13440
08/10/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/19/99; 1/20/99; 1/21/99. To Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentine. 00-13965
09/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief. 00-15477
09/13/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Appellant's Opening Brief. 00-16093
10/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We grant respondent's motion to strike and direct the clerk of this court to strike appellant's opening brief filed on August 2, 2000. Appellant shall, within 30 days from the date of this order, file an amended opening brief and an appendix. Failue to comply with the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure in the preparation of the amended opening brief and the appendix may result in the imposition of sanctions against appellant's counsel. Within 10 days from the date of this order, appellant shall file a supplemental transcript request form requesting preparation and filing of all transcripts necessary, including the Petrocelli hearing conducted on January 12, 1999. Alternatively, in the event certified copies of the necessary transcripts have been prepared and filed in the district court and will be included in appellant's appendix, appellant shall so inform this court in writing. Respondent shall have 30 days from the filing of appellant's amended opening brief and appendix to file the answering brief. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Stricken by order 10/23/00: Appellant's Opening Brief filed on 08/092/00.) 00-18758
11/06/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-19499
11/22/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 22, 2000. 00-20555
12/27/2000BriefFiled Amended Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/26/00. 00-22511
12/27/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 00-22512
01/25/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 26, 2001. 01-01700
01/29/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: January 19 and 20, 1999. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin. 01-01852
02/28/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 01-03668
02/28/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-03669
03/29/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: April 30, 2001. 01-05468
04/30/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-07171
05/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. Appellant shall have to and including June 14, 2001, to file and serve a reply brief. We caution appellant's counsel that failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances for additional requests for extensions of time to file the reply brief may result in the denial of the motion. 01-07322
05/10/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 9, 1999. Court Reporter: Kris Johnson. 01-07881
06/15/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-10040
06/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On June 15, 2001, appellant filed a motion for a third extension of time to file and serve the reply brief. We conclude that appellant has not demonstrated extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. We deny appellant's motion. Appellant shall file and serve the reply brief within 10 days of the date of this order. No further extensions of time shall be permitted except upon demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Failure to demonstrate extreme and unforeseeable circumstances in additional motions for extensions of time may result in the denial of the motion and imposition of sanctions. 01-10939
07/10/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 07/09/01. 01-11575
01/17/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 02-01184
01/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP02-CY/DA/ML
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML. 02-08460
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-08544
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 15, 2002. 02-08544