judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

S. E. WHITE v. M. M. WHITE, ET AL.

Case: A-49
A-49
02/01/1944
Application for Writ of Error
S. E. WHITE
M. M. WHITE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/22/1944Errata FiledPetitioner
04/18/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/16/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
02/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/16/1944Letter Filed
04/22/1944Errata Filed
04/22/1944Response to Motion filed
04/18/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/16/1944Supplemental Brief filed
02/22/1944Miscellaneous Motion
02/16/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/01/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/01/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S. E. WhitePetitioner
M. M. White, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information