St V Chadwell | § § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B | ||||
1701 Lynch Hollow Rd La Follette, TN 37766 | |||||
State Plaintiff | State of Indiana | William Calhoun Hartley
| |||
Charges: Chadwell, James B | Citation | Statute | Level | Date | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
1. | ILL POSS OF ALCOHOL- | N/A | 7.1-5-7-7(1) | Misdemeanor Class C | 06/06/1998 |
06/08/1998 | Converted Event docket level comment: MP | ||
---|---|---|---|
06/08/1998 | Converted Event Docket Note: WCPD | ||
06/09/1998 | Converted Event Defendant appears in custody of Sheriff and without counsel. State appears by William C. Hartley, Deputy Prosecutor. Court finds probable cause. Defendant advised of his rights. Defendant enters a plea of guilty to Minor In Possession Of Alcohol Class C Misdemeanor. Court accepts plea and finds the defendant guilty. Court imposes no fine but costs are assessed. Defendant sentenced to 60 days Wabash County Jail. Suspended all but 5 days (credit given for time spent) and places defendant on informal probation for 360 days on the following conditions: 1. Not to be charged with any new criminal offense based upon probable cause. 2. Not possess or consume alcohol. 3. Enter and complete all recommendations of the Wabash County Drug and Alcohol Program. 4. Pay within 30 days. Pay $50.00 Probation Fee. mls/ll (DISPOSED: GP ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 06/08/1998 Vol./Book 29, Page 279 | ||
06/09/1998 | Judgment 1. ILL POSS OF ALCOHOL- Conversion Unknown | ||
07/13/1998 | Converted Event State files Petition To Revoke Probation. mls/ll (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/10/1998 | ||
07/13/1998 | Converted Event On 6-8-98, Defendant ordered to pay $150.00 Program Fee. mls/ll (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/13/1998 Vol./Book 30, Page 206 | ||
07/31/1998 | Converted Event Court finds probable cause. Court orders defendant to appear for 1st hearing on Revocation Of Probation on 8-13-98 at 9:00 a.m. rb/ll Defendant still owing $125.00 Court costs. rb/ll (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 07/31/1998 Vol./Book 30, Page 407 | ||
08/13/1998 | Converted Event Calendar: FINE & COURT COST HEARING (Time: 09:00:00) (Judge: 02 ) | ||
08/13/1998 | Converted Event Defendant fails to appear. Warrant issued. mls/ll (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 08/13/1998 Vol./Book 31, Page 109 | ||
02/22/1999 | Converted Event The Defendant resides out of State. Court orders case to closed file. mls/ll (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 02/22/1999 Vol./Book 35, Page 349 | ||
02/23/1999 | Converted Event Calendar (Judge: 02 ) |
Case Number | Citation Number | Defendant Info | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
| |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
85D01-9806-CM-000517 | Chadwell, James B | 06/08/1998 Wabash Superior Court | CM - Criminal Misdemeanor Decided |
|