judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTINE WITHERSPOON v. TETON LASER CENTER, LCC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; and MAURA LOFARO, M.D.,

Case Heading (06-11)
Case Number:06-11Case Docketed On:01/09/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:CHRISTINE WITHERSPOON v. TETON LASER CENTER, LCC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; and MAURA LOFARO, M.D.,
Full Title:CHRISTINE WITHERSPOON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TETON LASER CENTER, LCC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company; and MAURA LOFARO, M.D., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristine WitherspoonDavid F. DeFazio
AppelleeTeton Laser Center, LLCW. Henry Combs III
Kathleen Joanne Swanson
AppelleeMaura LofaroW. Henry Combs III
Kathleen Joanne Swanson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 3
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/09/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/09/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/11/2006Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
02/17/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/17/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Other. Received copy of supplement to docket index from clerk of district court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
04/24/2006Brief - Appellees; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
05/09/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/09/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts and exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/15/2006Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/16/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/21/2006Order - Assignment of judge. Filed order recusing Justice Kite and assigning Nicholas G. Kalokathis, District Judge.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
06/28/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Chief Justice Hill, Justices Golden, Voigt, and Burke, and Kalokathis, DJ (David F. DeFazio for appellant; W. Henry Combs, III and Kathleen Swanson for appellees, argument by Ms. Swanson), and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/28/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/10/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/30/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal