judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TRACEY DINGLE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-0832
Short Caption:TRACEY DINGLE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM759-10Filed Date:07/02/2010

Opening Event Date:07/02/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/03/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/20/2010
Argued/Submitted:05/03/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTracey Dingle Y
Warren GormanYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/19/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Warren Gorman, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
07/19/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Warren Gorman, Esquire
07/28/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
11/03/2010RECORD INDEX
11/03/2010RECORD COPIES
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (Pretrial Services report filed 10/27/10) ****SEALED*******
11/03/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (90pgs/Swaringer) 6/8/10 proc. w/CD
11/03/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/09/2010RECEIVED - aplt's brief w/appdx.
11/19/2010ORDERED: That the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
11/19/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/19/2010APPENDIX
12/20/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
12/20/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
04/05/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
05/03/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/03/2011SUBMITTED to Washington,Glickman,Pryor.
05/12/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Glickman, Associate Judge, and Pryor, Senior Judge.)
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED