judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORRIS VS. URBANICK

Case Information: 36248
Short Caption:NORRIS VS. URBANICKCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36128
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9901602AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/13/2000 / Eisenberg, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of Lawrence J. Winking--check no. 1062.
06/09/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09753
06/13/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert L. Eisenberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/10/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 14, 2000. 00-11703
07/19/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-12468
07/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-13154
08/02/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-13380
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NNP/CLK 00-14079
08/11/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.