judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DIXON VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36249
Short Caption:DIXON VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/09/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
06/09/2000Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. 00-09770
06/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents: 20 days from the date of this order. 00-15787
09/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Real Party in Interest State of Nevada) 00-17016
09/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Real Party in Interest Amy Harvey, Washoe County Clerk) 00-17185
10/02/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Real party in interest State of Nevada shall have to and including October 30, 2000, to file and serve an answer to the petition for writ of mandamus. 00-17281
10/02/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Real party in interest Amy Harvey shall have to and including October 20, 2000, to file and serve an answer to the petition for writ of mandamus. 00-17282
10/17/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. (Amy Harvey). 00-18429
10/24/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus (The State of Nevada). 00-18830
11/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Granting Petition. Order Granting Petition for Writ of Mandamus. ". . . we grant this petition." The clerk of this court shall issue a writ of mandamus. fn1[We have received and considered petitioners' proper person documents. We deny as moot petitioner's proper person motion to file a reply to the answer.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20185
11/17/2000WritIssued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. Janet J. Berry, District Judge, by this office. 00-20197
11/17/2000WritFiled Writ. Served on Hon. Janet J. Berry, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. 00-20197
12/13/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-20261
12/13/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.