judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SUZANNE K. MOYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-133)
Case Number:06-133Case Docketed On:06/14/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:SUZANNE K. MOYER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SUZANNE K. MOYER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSuzanne K. MoyerKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/14/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/14/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/14/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/31/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/31/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/18/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/27/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
11/29/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
11/30/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/30/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal