judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JERRY T. GRAHAM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0833
Short Caption:JERRY T. GRAHAM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL1774-94Filed Date:06/29/2010

Opening Event Date:06/29/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJerry T. Graham YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Vivien Cockburn NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
06/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on June 29, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
07/21/2010RECORD INDEX
07/21/2010RECORD COPIES
07/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
07/30/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: Jerry T. Graham #04515-000 U.S.P. Lewisburg Lewisburg, PA 17837
08/05/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/13/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/13/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
10/18/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/19/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief
01/31/2011On consideration of appellee's motion for summary affirmance, the brief of appellant and the record on appeal, it is ORDERED that the motion for summart affirmance is granted (SEE ORDER). FO that the order on appeal is hereby affirmed. (RZBRKG)
01/31/2011AFFIRMED
02/22/2011MANDATE ISSUED