judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

G. A. ROBERTS v. TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY

Case: A-57
A-57
02/07/1944
Application for Writ of Error
G. A. ROBERTS
TEXAS AND PACIFIC RAILWAY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/30/1944Response to Brief filedPetitioner
03/29/1944Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/16/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
02/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/24/1944Letter Filed
03/30/1944Response to Brief filed
03/29/1944Brief on the Merits
03/21/1944Submission reset
03/14/1944Bond
03/08/1944Document received (See Remarks)
02/16/1944Response to Petition
02/07/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/07/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G. A. RobertsPetitioner
Texas and Pacific Railway CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information