Case: 01-03-00923-CR
01-03-00923-CR
08/08/2003
Aggravated sexual assault
Robert Casper May
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/30/2004 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |||
10/10/2003 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |||
09/25/2003 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed for want of jurisdiction |
| ||
09/24/2003 | Submitted | | |||
09/03/2003 | Clerk's record received (transcript) | | |||
08/08/2003 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||
07/17/2003 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||
06/28/1998 | Record due | | |||
04/29/1998 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/30/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Renee Ann Mueller |
May, Robert Casper | Appellant | Robert Casper May |
Trial Court Information
21st District Court
Burleson
Honorable John L. Placke
11802, Count 2
40 Yrs TDC, $211.25 Court Costs, & $300 Court Appointed Attorney Fee