judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD DOUGLASS v. THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING, THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF INFORMATION, STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0110)
Case Number:S-07-0110Case Docketed On:05/16/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Administration of the Government (Title 9)
Short Title:RICHARD DOUGLASS v. THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING, THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF INFORMATION, STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD DOUGLASS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, STATE OF WYOMING, THE WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF INFORMATION, STATE OF WYOMING, Appellees, (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard DouglassTimothy Charles Kingston
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
AppelleeAdministration and Information - Human Resources DivisionPatrick J. Crank
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Jurisdiction, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 77
Citation:187 P.3d 850 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/16/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/16/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/20/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/06/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
08/09/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/27/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
09/06/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, one volume. Volume I, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/09/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/25/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/25/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/29/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal