judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MATTHEW COLBERT V. JEFFERSON CAPITOL YARDS

Case Information: 10-CV-0824
Short Caption:MATTHEW COLBERT V. JEFFERSON CAPITOL YARDSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB6041-10Filed Date:07/01/2010

Opening Event Date:07/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMatthew Colbert NPro SeN
AppelleeJefferson Capitol YardsN
Sheldon P. SchumanNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/16/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 1, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
10/12/2010 On consideration of this court's order of July 16, 2010, directing appellant to file the statement regarding transcript, within 20 days, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
10/12/2010DISMISSED
11/03/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived