judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTHONY HEINEMANN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-122)
Case Number:06-122Case Docketed On:06/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Certiorari
Short Title:ANTHONY HEINEMANN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANTHONY HEINEMANN, Petitioner, v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerAnthony Lee HeinemannDiane Elizabeth Courselle
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
Melissa M. Swearingen

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/07/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/07/2006Motion - In forma pauperisMotionIn forma pauperisFinal
06/07/2006Petition - Writ - review or in the alternative petition for writ of certiorariPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
06/07/2006Notice-Incoming - Other - courtesy copy of available transcripts in First Judicial Docket No. 24-474Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/20/2006Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
06/26/2006Response/Objection - Reply to State's opposition to petition for writ of reviewResponse/ObjectionReplyFinal
06/28/2006Order - Petition for review - deny (faxed copy to Defender Aid Clinic)OrderPetition for review - denyFinal
06/28/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal