Case: 10-08-00294-CR
10-08-00294-CR
08/18/2008
Forgery
Helen Mayfield
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/03/2010 | Reply brief filed | Appellant | |
12/31/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | State | |
09/01/2009 | Amended brief filed | Pro Se | |
08/26/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant | |
05/28/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Pro Se | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/29/2019 | Notice received |
| |||
08/24/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/11/2016 | Letter received |
| |||
05/02/2014 | Letter received | | |||
06/16/2011 | Case stored | | |||
03/16/2011 | Mandate issued | | |||
02/22/2011 | Case returned from higher court | | |||
02/22/2011 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||
12/03/2010 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||
11/03/2010 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Motion or Writ Struck | | ||
09/22/2010 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||
09/13/2010 | Response filed | | |||
08/31/2010 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||
07/28/2010 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
07/28/2010 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
07/28/2010 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
07/28/2010 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
07/28/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
07/28/2010 | Retention time case file will be retained | | |||
07/28/2010 | Judgment Issued | | |||
07/28/2010 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||
05/05/2010 | Submitted | | |||
05/04/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
05/03/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed | | |||
05/03/2010 | Reply brief filed | | |||
04/06/2010 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied | | |||
03/26/2010 | Letter received | | |||
02/19/2010 | Certificate of service filed | | |||
02/04/2010 | Certificate of service requested | | |||
01/28/2010 | Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed | | |||
01/19/2010 | Motion filed | | |||
01/19/2010 | Motion filed | | |||
01/19/2010 | Objection filed | | |||
01/19/2010 | Motion filed | | |||
01/12/2010 | Motion to strike disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
01/12/2010 | Motion to exceed brief length disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
01/05/2010 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
12/31/2009 | Case ready to be set | | |||
12/31/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||
12/31/2009 | Motion to exceed brief length filed | | |||
12/31/2009 | Motion to strike filed | | |||
12/11/2009 | Response filed | | |||
12/08/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; no further extensions of time will be entertained | | ||
12/01/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
12/01/2009 | Motion disposed | Dismissed as moot | | ||
11/12/2009 | Response filed | | |||
11/12/2009 | Certificate of service filed | | |||
11/03/2009 | Letter received | | |||
11/03/2009 | Certificate of service requested | | |||
11/02/2009 | Motion filed | | |||
10/22/2009 | Letter received | | |||
10/14/2009 | Response filed | | |||
10/06/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored | | ||
10/02/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
09/01/2009 | Amended brief filed | | |||
08/26/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
08/04/2009 | Motion to strike disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
08/04/2009 | Motion to exceed brief length disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
07/08/2009 | Response filed | | |||
07/07/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored | | ||
06/30/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
06/23/2009 | Letter received | | |||
06/05/2009 | Motion to exceed brief length filed | | |||
06/05/2009 | Response filed | | |||
06/01/2009 | Motion to strike filed | | |||
05/28/2009 | Motion to exceed brief length filed | | |||
05/28/2009 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||
05/19/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion granted; no further extensions of time will be entertained | | ||
05/15/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||
05/07/2009 | Letter received | | |||
05/07/2009 | Letter received | | |||
04/14/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
04/13/2009 | Letter received | | |||
04/13/2009 | Motion filed | | |||
04/13/2009 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
04/13/2009 | Letter received | | |||
04/02/2009 | Letter received | | |||
03/31/2009 | Clerks notice to court regarding status of record | | |||
03/31/2009 | Notice of late brief | | |||
03/25/2009 | Letter issued by the court | | |||
03/11/2009 | Letter received | | |||
02/20/2009 | Reporters record filed | | |||
02/19/2009 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||
01/26/2009 | Notice of late record | Clerk's record not filed - 10 day letter | | ||
12/16/2008 | Motion to reinstate disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
11/24/2008 | Motion to reinstate filed | | |||
11/04/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion granted; further extensions disfavored | | ||
10/30/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
10/07/2008 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
09/30/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
09/29/2008 | Clerks record filed | | |||
09/26/2008 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||
09/18/2008 | Docketing statement requested | | |||
08/18/2008 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||
07/29/2008 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/16/2036 | Case Stored | Destroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas, The State of | Criminal - State of Texas | Bill R. Turner Douglas Howell III |
Mayfield, Helen | Appellant | Helen Mayfield |
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable Steven Lee Smith
07-05455-CRF-361
24 mths