judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

J.D. WHEELER, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1272
Short Caption:J.D. WHEELER, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9634-87Filed Date:10/26/1989

Opening Event Date:10/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/06/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/17/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/06/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/07/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJ.D. Wheeler, Jr.N
John K. Lunsford YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Carolyn K. Kolben YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WHEELER JR., J.D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
10/26/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN K. LUNSFORD, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 122689 SCHPRD R
01/10/1990COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM SHELTON - 9/26/89 PROCEEDING (NO TRIAL) JB PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD RT
03/28/1990ORDER APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELDDW SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD DSA
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (172 PGS. -- SWARINGER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990RECORD COMPLETED
04/09/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD DSA
10/30/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR SWARINGER CERTIFICA- TION OF 11/24/87 PROC. (ORDER CANCELLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1990ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 40 DAYS. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD B
01/22/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT IN APPMNT BEING VAC. GW PANELRO SCDATE 011591 SCHPRD V
02/01/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 020191 SCHPRD BA
04/24/1991ORDER BRF OF APLE DUE IN 5 OR CASE TO BE SCHED ON REC & BRF OF APLT ALONE. DAS PANELJAC SCDATE 031191 SCHPRD BE
04/26/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 24, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 042191 SCHPRD BE
05/01/1991ORDER GR APLE MO TO EXT TM FL BRF TO 5/24/91. NFX. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 042991 SCHPRD K
05/17/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 052491 SCHPRD BE
05/17/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/06/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/06/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGFEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (RG FE MK)
04/07/1992MANDATE ISSUED