judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELLE E. MAGRUDER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1265
Short Caption:DONNELLE E. MAGRUDER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F12936-87Filed Date:10/23/1989

Opening Event Date:10/23/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/22/1991
Argued/Submitted:09/09/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/02/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnelle E. Magruder N
Sheila B. AlbrightYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Claudette V. Humphreys NN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MAGRUDER, DONNELLE E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CHARLES A. MALLORY NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 03/05/90 ORD: ITS RENEWAL IN NOTE - 02 THE TR CT IN THE 1ST INSTANCE; NOTE - 03 FO MOT FOR EXTENSION OF TIME NOTE - 03 TO FILE BA GRANTED TO EXTENT NOTE - 04 THAT COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STMT NOTE - 04 W/IN 20 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS NOTE - 05 ORDER INDICATING STATUS OF MOT NOTE - 05 FOR TRANSCRIPT.
10/23/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/06/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SHEILA ALBRIGHT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/15/1989RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT MO TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT ON EXPEDITED BASIS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 16, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD RTC PANEL SCDATE 122289 SCHPRD R
03/05/1990ORDER DENYING APLT'S MOT FOR EXPED. TRANSCRIPT W/OUT PREJUDICE TO (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 5) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (36-PGS/TANNER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 030890 SCHPRD RT
04/02/1990STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (5 PGS. -- BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (234 PGS. -- HAWKINS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1990RECORD COMPLETED
02/14/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1991ORDER APLT BRF TO BE FLD W/IN 40 DYS FRM DT OF THIS ORDER. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD GR
03/22/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
06/02/1992FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
09/09/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/09/1992SUBMITTED (TE SC KG)
09/09/1992SUMMARY I CALENDAR
09/11/1992AFFIRMED MOJ (TE SC KG)
10/02/1992MANDATE ISSUED