judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEATTS, JAMES D. ROBINSON, JACK

Case Information: 86-CV-0170
Short Caption:KEATTS, JAMES D. ROBINSON, JACKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1642-83Filed Date:01/07/1986

Opening Event Date:01/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/30/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/04/1986
Argued/Submitted:04/15/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/17/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Jeffry A. Kappstatter YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Margaret A. Beller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard G. Amato NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901KEATTS, JAMES D. ET AL ROBINSON, JACK ET AL
01/01/1905TRDATE- 87/04/15 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KAPPSTATTERJ FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - BELLERM FOR - APLE ROBINSON ATTY 3 - AMATOR FOR - DC
01/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/07/1986ORDER APLTS IN 10 DAYS OTSC - DISM (NO CAS & FEE) SL PANELPY SCDATE 012286 SCHPRD CAS
03/17/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER AND DR/SRT ATTACHED TO RESPONSE GG PANEL SCDATE 031786 SCHPRD ANSA
03/17/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1986CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD AND SRT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/26/1986ORDER FILING THE LODGED CAS, DR/SRT; NO 7A; APLTS TO CAUSE REC. TO BE PREP & TRANS FORTHWITH SL PANELPY SCDATE 033186 SCHPRD CHECK
04/14/1986RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE TO 3/26/86 ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (EXHIBIT: 2 SM BROWN ENVELOPE) (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 052686 SCHPRD R
07/30/1986FiledRecord Completed
07/30/1986SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (139 PGS - RONAN) JB PANEL SCDATE 051986 SCHPRD RT
09/08/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 22ND JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 090886 SCHPRD BA
09/22/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6, 1986 RJG PANEL SCDATE 092286 SCHPRD BA
10/06/1986RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1986APPELLANT'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/15/1986ORDER GRANT MO. CLK IS DIR TO FILE LDGD APLT'S BRIEF; APLE'S BRIEF DUE IN 3O DAYS. TTC PANELPY SCDATE 100686 SCHPRD OPE
11/06/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 8TH (NO OPPO) JB TTC PANEL SCDATE 111486 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOV. 28TH MLH TTC PANEL SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD BE
12/01/1986RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/04/1986FiledBriefing Completed
12/04/1986APPELEE'S BRIEF TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/08/1986MEMORANDUM OF APPELLEE (DC) IN LIEU OF BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 120886 SCHPRD BE
04/15/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/15/1987ARGUED PANELNWTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987LETTER FROM APPELLEE RE REQUEST AT ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JUDGMENT AF IN PART & RM IN .. PART FOR FURTHER PRCDGS JDGMT/ ON APPEAL PANELNWTEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRM METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 544 A.2d 716
07/25/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 1386
08/17/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990MEMORANDUM EXHIBIT RETURN TO ACO 4/6/90 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD