judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BROOKEN, BENOIT AMERICAN SECURITY BANK

Case Information: 86-CV-0183
Short Caption:BROOKEN, BENOIT AMERICAN SECURITY BANKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT76187-85Filed Date:01/30/1986

Opening Event Date:01/30/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/01/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/1986
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBenoit Brookens NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James E. Tompert NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joseph M. Cahill YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROOKEN, BENOIT ET AL AMERICAN SECURITY BANK
01/30/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/01/1986FiledRecord Completed
12/31/1986FiledBriefing Completed
04/23/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition