judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FISHER, BEN C. BANDER, ROBERT N.

Case Information: 86-CV-0259
Short Caption:FISHER, BEN C. BANDER, ROBERT N.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA5630-85Filed Date:02/07/1986

Opening Event Date:02/07/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/15/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/19/1986
Argued/Submitted:10/22/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Barry H. Gottfried YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Warren S. Rosenfeld YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FISHER, BEN C. BANDER, ROBERT N.
01/01/1906 MARTINV PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF APLE
02/07/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1986FiledRecord Completed
06/19/1986FiledBriefing Completed
10/22/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/31/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition