judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARTIN, GLADYS E. WALLS JR., HAL

Case Information: 86-CV-0174
Short Caption:MARTIN, GLADYS E. WALLS JR., HALClassification:Appeals - Small Claims - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC9010-85Filed Date:06/10/1985

Opening Event Date:06/10/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/20/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/04/1987
Argued/Submitted:09/09/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Philip Clarke Baten YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Christine Dennis Leflore NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Marva Lavonne Parker NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Alda A. Anderson NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARTIN, GLADYS E. WALLS JR., HAL
06/10/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/20/1986FiledRecord Completed
02/04/1987FiledBriefing Completed
09/09/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/23/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition