judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADAMS, MARGARET R. JONATHAN WOODNER COMPANY

Case Information: 86-CV-0210
Short Caption:ADAMS, MARGARET R. JONATHAN WOODNER COMPANYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Lead:86-CV-0210Consolidated: 86-CV-1245
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LT49311-79Filed Date:01/10/1986

Opening Event Date:01/10/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/20/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/27/1987
Argued/Submitted:03/24/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Roy L. Pearson, Jr.YY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Arthur D. Mckey YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADAMS, MARGARET R. ET AL JONATHAN WOODNER COMPANY
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 062686 ORD: DENY MO FOR ENTRY NOTE - 01 OF ORD DIRECTING PREPARATION NOTE - 02 OF RT W/O PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL NOTE - 02 IF NO OTHER APLT OBTAINS A NOTE - 03 TRANSCRIPT; CLERK TO REMOVE NOTE - 03 APLTS LASTENIA BRATHWAITE, NOTE - 04 JENIFER EDWARDS, ANN GRANT, NOTE - 04 PAMELA PARTEE & JACQUELINE NOTE - 05 RICHARDSON AS PARTIES IN THIS NOTE - 05 APPEAL. NOTE - 06 CON 86-1245. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 032487 ORD: GRANT APLE MO IN NOTE - 07 86-1170 TO EXT TM TO FL OPPO NOTE - 08 TO APLT MO FOR STAY & CLERK TO NOTE - 08 FL LODGED OPPO; DENY MO FOR NOTE - 09 SUMM AFFIRMANCE & MO TO DISMIS NOTE - 09 & DENY MO FOR STAY AS MOOT; NOTE - 10 GRANT MO TO CONS 86-210, NOTE - 10 86-1170 & 86-1245; GRANT APLT NOTE - 11 MO FOR LV TO FL DR/SRT & CLERK NOTE - 11 TO FL LODGED DR/SRT; APLT BRFS NOTE - 12 IN 86-210 & 86-1245 DUE 40 DYS NOTE - 12 AFTER RECORDS ARE FILED IN NOTE - 13 86-1170 & 86-1245. NOTE - 13 NOTE - 14 6/22/87 ORD: DENY MO OF APLE NOTE - 14 TO DISMISS; GRANT MO OF APLTS NOTE - 15 TO SEVER NO. 86-1170 FROM NOS. NOTE - 15 86-210 & 86-1245; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 16 APLT'S TO EXPEDITE & CLK TO NOTE - 16 PLACE 86-1170 ON CALENDAR AS NOTE - 17 SOON AS BIZ OF CRT PERMITS; NOTE - 17 APLT IN NO. 86-1170 TO FL NOTE - 18 FILE-STAMPED COPIES OF MEMO NOTE - 18 REFERRED TO IN PARAGRAPH 2 NOTE - 19 SUBSECTIONS (A) & (B) OF ITS NOTE - 19 OPPO TO MO OF APLE TO DISMISS NOTE - 20 FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE & NOTE - 20 UPON SUCH FILING THE MEMO TO NOTE - 21 BE DESIGNATED AS SUPP RECORD NOTE - 21 IN NO. 86-1170;BRF OF APLT IN NOTE - 22 NO. 86-1170 DUE BY 7/17/87 & NOTE - 22 BRF OF APLE DUE BY 8/10/87; NOTE - 23 APLT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/20/87 NOTE - 23 TO FL A REPLY BRF; MO OF APLTS NOTE - 24 IN NOS. 86-210 & 86-1245 FOR NOTE - 24 EXT OF TM TO DESIGNATE & NOTE - 25 TRANSMIT ADDITIONAL PORTIONS NOTE - 25 OF TRL CRT RECORD IS GRANTED & NOTE - 26 CLK TO FL LODGED SUPPLEMENTAL NOTE - 26 DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APP; NOTE - 27 CNSOLIDATED BRFS OF APLT'S IN NOTE - 27 NOS. 86-210 & 86-1245 DUE IN NOTE - 28 40 DAYS FROM THE DATE THE SUPP NOTE - 28 RECORD ON APPEAL IS FILED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/03/24 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PEARSONR FOR - APPELLANTS ATTY 2 - MCKEYA FOR - APPELLEE
01/10/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/13/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1986RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR ENTRY OF ORD DIRECTING THE PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT FOR USE ON APL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/11/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION OF APLT FOR ENTRY OF ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1986STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL OF CERTAIN APTL'S (J. EDWARDS, L. BRAITHWAITE, A. GRANT, P. PARTEE & J. RICHARSON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 ACG PANELFETE SCDATE 061386 SCHPRD VS
08/05/1986ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 071086 SCHPRD CHECK
08/08/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE 8/5/86 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF BRIEF IN 40 DAYS GG PANEL SCDATE 091586 SCHPRD BA
08/08/1986STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF TRANSCRIPT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1986APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE 86-210 & 86-1245 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1986APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS 86-210, 86-1170 & 86-1245 JB PANEL SCDATE 100186 SCHPRD OPE
09/22/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) SUPPLEMENTARY JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1986APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE GG PANEL SCDATE 100186 SCHPRD CHECK
03/03/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (473 PGS - TANNER) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (141 PGS - SCHOCH) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD SRT ACG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-13 ACG PANELMKBE SCDATE 081986 SCHPRD OPE
03/24/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MO FOR STAY. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL CASE 86-1170 FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042287 SCHPRD CHECK
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (110 PGS - RAMOS) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (90 PGS - J & J) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME TO DESIGNATE ADDITIONAL PORTIONS OF TRIAL RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/18/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE 86-1170 JB PANEL SCDATE 051887 SCHPRD OPE
05/20/1987FiledRecord Completed
05/22/1987MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANTS TO DECONSOLIDATE & SCHEDULE EXPEDITED ORAL ARG. IN 86-1170 ON JULY CAL. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1987APPELLEE'S REPLY IN 86-1170 TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE JB PANEL SCDATE 052587 SCHPRD CHECK
05/29/1987APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DECONSOLIDATE & EXPEDITED ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 052987 SCHPRD OPE
06/05/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 062987 SCHPRD BA
06/17/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD SUPP RECORD. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/22/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14-28. DAS PANELBETE SCDATE 050887 SCHPRD TMC
06/24/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 20TH JB PANEL SCDATE 070787 SCHPRD BE
06/25/1987APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD OPA
07/10/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT, MEMO OPINION AND ORDER, DEF. SUPP. DESIGNATION) PB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD SR
07/28/1987ORDER GRANT APLE MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR ONLY TO EXTENT APLE BR DUE W/IN 30 DAYS-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD CHECK
08/27/1987FiledBriefing Completed
08/27/1987APPELEE'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 082787 SCHPRD BE
03/24/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/24/1988ARGUED PANELPYMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/29/1988RECEIVED RECEIPT FOR RETURN OF 3 TRANS- CRIPTS SUBMITTED BY A.J. MCKEY COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF RULING ON APPEAL PANELPYMKFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE (CC STATEMENT - FERREN)
08/09/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD