Case Information: 46701 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE VS. LEWIS (MARK) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211600 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/31/2006 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/31/2006 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 06-02270 | |
01/31/2006 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: December 1, 2005 and January 19, 2006. Court Reporter: Lisa A. Lizotte. Filed in district court on: January 25, 2005. | 06-02271 | |
02/27/2006 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. | 06-04252 | |
03/16/2006 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 06-05738 | |
04/10/2006 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP06-WM/MG/JH | 06-07531 | |
05/05/2006 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 06-07683 | |
05/05/2006 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/05/2006 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2006. | 06-07683 |