judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PRICE, WILLIE JAMES PERPETUAL AMERICAN BANK

Case Information: 86-CV-0175
Short Caption:PRICE, WILLIE JAMES PERPETUAL AMERICAN BANKClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8073-84Filed Date:01/24/1986

Opening Event Date:01/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/08/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/30/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/27/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWillie James NPro SeN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard A. Cooter NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Martin F. McMahonYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Steven J. KramerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PRICE, WILLIE JAMES PERPETUAL AMERICAN BANK
01/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/08/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/30/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/27/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/30/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition