judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES COLBERT, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1261
Short Caption:CHARLES COLBERT, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11680-87Filed Date:09/28/1989

Opening Event Date:09/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/22/1991
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles Colbert, Jr.NPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Kristan L. PetersYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901COLBERT JR., CHARLES UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/2/90 ORD: GRANTG MO OF JAMES NOTE - 01 E. JOYNER, ESQ. TO W/DRAW AS NOTE - 02 COUNSEL FOR APLT; APPOINTING NOTE - 02 THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. TO NOTE - 03 REPRESENT APLT HEREIN; FORMER NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO TRANSMIT RECORDS TO NOTE - 04 NEW COUNSEL FORTHWITH; NEW NOTE - 04 COUNSEL TO FILE STMT W/IN 20 NOTE - 05 DAYS ADVISING THIS CT WHETHER NOTE - 05 TRANSCRIPT WILL BE PREPARED. NOTE - 06 12/11/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT MO & NOTE - 06 CLK OF SUPER CRT TO PREPARED NOTE - 07 & TRANSMIT EXHS 1,2,2A,3,4,8, NOTE - 07 & 9 AS SPECIFIED IN APLT'S NOTE - 08 MO TO THIS CRT AS A SUPLMTAL NOTE - 08 REC FORTHWITH.
01/01/1906 JOYNERJ VACATED 3/2/90
09/28/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/20/1989LETTER REQUESTING APLT TO FILE FORM 5 AFFIDAVIT & MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD ANSA
01/03/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990ORDER GRANTING APLT'S MFP; FO APLT TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD DSA
02/06/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF JAMES JOYNER APLT'S COUNSEL --- APLT WILL NOW GO PRO SE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT, PRO SE FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS RUFFIN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD OPE
03/16/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 3-2-90 ORDER RE TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 032290 SCHPRD ANSA
06/13/1990COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT #1(450 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 080890 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(11 PGS - GLEASON) PF PANEL SCDATE 080790 SCHPRD RT
07/19/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-7-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD BA
09/05/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/7/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 083190 SCHPRD V
09/18/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS. FAILURE MAY RESULT IN APPOINTMENT BEING VACATED. GW PANELRO SCDATE 091490 SCHPRD V
09/27/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO INCLUDE PERTINENT EXHIBITS IN APPELLATE RECORD & TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO PROVIDE EXHIBITS FOR APPELLATE RECORD AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/11/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 6 THRU 8. GW PANELRO SCDATE 111690 SCHPRD TO
12/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (GOVT. EXHIBITS 2A, 4A & 8 NOT SUBMITTED IN LOWER COURT) RJG PANEL SCDATE 123190 SCHPRD SR
12/20/1990RECORD COMPLETED
01/22/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD GR
02/06/1991LETTER IN RE CASE FROM APLE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030491 SCHPRD BA
03/18/1991RECEIVED APPELLANTS BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991ORDER GRT APLT MO FOR LV TO FL LODGE BRF, BRF FL & APLE'S BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS OF ORDER. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 041091 SCHPRD B
04/22/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 051691 SCHPRD BE
04/22/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
10/30/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO ALLOW APLT TO SUB- MIT ON THE RECORD WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENTS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOTION TO SUBMIT ON 11/14/91 REG CAL. MEH PANELROTEPY SCDATE 103191 SCHPRD VS
11/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/24/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PY 601 A.2d 603
01/24/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PY PAGE # - 0231
02/14/1992MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD