judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBINSON, JACK SARISKY, JOSEPH L.

Case Information: 86-CV-0258
Short Caption:ROBINSON, JACK SARISKY, JOSEPH L.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA8895-81Filed Date:02/06/1986

Opening Event Date:02/06/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/24/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/15/1987
Argued/Submitted:11/05/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Margaret A. Beller YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John J. Brennan, IIIYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Richard M. Tarby NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROBINSON, JACK ET AL SARISKY, JOSEPH L.
02/06/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/24/1987FiledRecord Completed
07/15/1987FiledBriefing Completed
11/05/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/07/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition