judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOUGLAS, CLARENCE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL

Case Information: 86-CV-0166
Short Caption:DOUGLAS, CLARENCE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:86-CV-0166Consolidated: 86-CV-0168 , 86-CV-0179
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA15942-82Filed Date:01/15/1986

Opening Event Date:01/15/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/16/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/06/1989
Argued/Submitted:01/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/26/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Paula W. Roberts YN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Barbara M. Milstein NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Judith G. Waxman NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Lutz Alexander Prager YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Denise C. Andresen NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Barbara Straub WilliamsNN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
David C. Beck NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James C. Pyles YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DOUGLAS, CLARENCE ET AL DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION ET AL
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 83-1148 & 83-1149 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 3/4/86 ORD: GRANTING MOS TO NOTE - 02 WAIVE 7A; NO 7A; SUA SPONTE NOTE - 03 CNSOLIDATING 86-166, 86-168 & NOTE - 03 86-179; APLT DOUGLAS, ET AL., NOTE - 04 TO FILE DR/SRT IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 CON 86-168 & 86-179 NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 040886 ORDER: VACATE 3/21 OTSC NOTE - 06 PARTIES TO TAKE NECESSARY NOTE - 07 STEPS TO HAVE REC PREPARED & NOTE - 07 TRANSMITTED FORTHWITH; APLTS NOTE - 08 DOUGLAS & BARRY, ET AL. TO NOTE - 08 FILE BRS W/IN 40 DAYS FROM THE NOTE - 09 DATE REC INCLUDING REPORTER'S NOTE - 09 TRANSCRIPT IS FILED. NOTE - 10 10/12/88 ORD: GRT REQUEST OF NOTE - 10 DAVID C. BECK, ESQ., AND HIS NOTE - 11 APPR AS CNSL FOR D.C. HOSPITAL NOTE - 11 ASSN IS HEREBY WITHDRAWN. FO NOTE - 12 THAT THE CLK IS DIRTD TO ENTER NOTE - 12 THE APPR OF JAMES C. PYLES, NOTE - 13 ESQ., AS CNSL TO REPRESENT NOTE - 13 D.C. HOSPITAL ASSN. NOTE - 14 3/31/89 ORD: GRT MO OF APLT/X- NOTE - 14 APLE TO FILE MEMO IN LIEU OF NOTE - 15 BRF, THE MO OF APLE/X-APLT TO NOTE - 15 CLARIFY BRFG SCHD AND TO EXT. NOTE - 16 TIME TO FILE BRF AND THE NOTE - 16 LODGED MEMO IN LIEU OF BRF OF NOTE - 17 APLT/X-APLE IN NO. 86-168 IS NOTE - 17 HEREBY FILED. FO THAT THE BRF NOTE - 18 OF APLE/X-APLT SHALL BE FILED NOTE - 18 ON OR BEFORE 4/27/89. NOTE - 19 6/26/89 ORD: THE APPR OF NOTE - 19 JUDITH G. WAXMAN, ESQ., AS NOTE - 20 CNSL FOR APLT IN NO. 86-166 IS NOTE - 20 HEREBY WITHDRAWN AND THE CLK NOTE - 21 IS DIRTD TO ENTER THE APPR OF NOTE - 21 PAULA W. ROBERTS, ESQ., AS NOTE - 22 CNSL TO REPRESENT APLT IN NO. NOTE - 22 86-166. FO THAT THE BRF OF NOTE - 23 D.C. HOSP. ASSN. SHALL BE NOTE - 23 FILED W/I 10 DAYS. NOTE - 24 1/30/91 ORD: THAT THE ORDER OF NOTE - 24 3/4/86 CONSOLIDATING NOS. NOTE - 25 86-166, 86-168, & 86-179 IS NOTE - 25 HEREBY VACATED. FO THAT NOS. NOTE - 26 86-166 & 86-168 ARE DISMISSED NOTE - 26 AS MOOT. FO THAT THE REQUEST NOTE - 27 OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA TO NOTE - 27 VACATE THE JMT OF THE TRIAL NOTE - 28 COURT IN NOS. 86-166 & 86-168 NOTE - 28 AND TO DISMISS THE UNDERLYING NOTE - 29 COUNTS OF THE COMPLAINT IS NOTE - 29 DENIED.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/01/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PYLESJ FOR - HOSP ASSN et al ATTY 2 - PRAGERL FOR - BARRY et al
01/01/1906 CC MARION S. BARRY ET AL BECKD WITHDRAWN PER 10/12/88 ORDER WAXMANJ WITHDRAWN PER 6/26/89 ORDER
01/15/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/30/1986MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO WAIVE CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 013086 SCHPRD CAS
01/30/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/31/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/07/1986APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WAIVE 7A GG PANEL SCDATE 021186 SCHPRD OPE
02/14/1986APPELLANT'S REPLY (MARION S. BARRY, JR.) TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WAIVE 7A GG PANEL SCDATE 021986 SCHPRD CHECK
03/04/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 CWC PANELPY SCDATE 021886 SCHPRD RBH
03/17/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (DC HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL) IN 86-179 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1986ORDER APLT IN 86-166 OTSC W/IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DIS- MISSED. (NO DR/SRT) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 031486 SCHPRD DR
03/28/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO 3/21/86 COURT ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 033186 SCHPRD ANSA
03/31/1986RECEIVED IN 86-168 RESPONSE OF MARION S. BARRY, ET AL, TO 3/21/86 OTSC JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/01/1986APPELLEE'S REPLY TO (CLARENCE DOUGLAS) RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/08/1986ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06 - 09. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040986 SCHPRD CHECK
05/12/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 060986 SCHPRD R
09/20/1988ORDER CT RPTR IN 20 DAYS TO COMP & FILE 10/30/85 RT - ABSO-NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD RT
09/27/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF DAVID C. BECK AS COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE (DCHA) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10 THRU 13 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD N
11/16/1988FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/16/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(112 PGS/PALMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD RT
12/23/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF (C. DOUGLAS) MLR PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD BA
12/27/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-10-89 AD (DC) PANEL SCDATE 012689 SCHPRD BE
01/03/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE BRIEF OF DC GT PANEL SCDATE 010989 SCHPRD OPA
01/25/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE (DCHA) TO CLARIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT(D.C.) TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN LIEU OF BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLANTS MEMO IN LIEU OF BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (DC HOSPITAL ASSN) TO 4/27/89 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989APPELLANT/CROSS-APPELLEE'S BRIEF IN NO. 86-168 (FOR ADS PURPOSES ONLY) SEE MEMO FILED 3/31/89 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989MEMORANDUM BY D.C. IN LIEU OF BRIEF IN NO. 86-168 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 14 THRU 18 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD CHECK
04/21/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS JUDITH G. WAXMAN, FOR APPEL- LANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989APLE-X-APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS TO MAY 29TH JB PANEL SCDATE 042789 SCHPRD BEA
05/05/1989APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION TO MXBEA FILED 5/4/89 RJG PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD OPA
05/09/1989APPELLEE'S REPLY TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME GT PANEL SCDATE 050589 SCHPRD CHECK
05/25/1989APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEDC HOSPITAL ASSOC. TO 30 DAYS AFTER FREE CARE REGS ARE PUB. RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 19 THRU 23 SL PANELRO SCDATE 051989 SCHPRD CHECK
07/06/1989FiledBriefing Completed
07/06/1989APPELLEE/CROSS-APPELLANT'S BRIEF AND ADDENDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 070689 SCHPRD BEA
08/10/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 8-17-89 AD (NO OPPO) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1989RECEIVED REPLY BRIEF (D.C.) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND NOS.86-166 & 168 FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AS MOOT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989APPEARANCE BARBARA E. STRAUB APLE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/29/1989APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF TO 9-22-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/07/1989ORDER APLE-X-APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 WHY D.C.'S MO TO REMAND SHDL NOT BE GRANTED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD Q
09/12/1989ORDER 9/7 ORD VACATED TO EXTENT THAT APLE-X-APLT MAY FL RESP TO MO TO REMAND BY 9/22/89. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD ANSE
09/15/1989REPLY JOINDER BY C. DOUGLAS IN MO OF DC TO VACATE JMT & REMAND 86-166 AS MOOT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/22/1989RECEIVED APLE-X-APLT'S (D.C. HOSPITAL ASSO.) REPLY BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/04/1990ARGUED PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APPELLANT COLUMBIA HOSPITAL ASSOC. FOR TRANSCRIPTION OF TAPE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL)BY DC IN SUPPORT OF MO. TO VACATE JUDG. & TO REMAND 86-166,168 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990APPELLEE'S REPLY TO STATEMENT BY D.C. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1990ORDER GRANT REQ OF APLE TO TRANSCRIB ARG TAPE & TO MAKE ARRANGEMENT W/CLK'S OFFICE. DAS PANELNWTWPY SCDATE 012990 SCHPRD VS
06/13/1990MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 6/12/90 LTR OF COUNSEL FOR APLE TO DIVISION. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1991FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/30/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 24 THRU 29 SL PANELNWTEPY SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD RDEC
01/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE AS MOOT
06/26/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD