judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNIE L. NEWSOME V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0069
Short Caption:JOHNNIE L. NEWSOME V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2356-86Filed Date:01/14/1987

Opening Event Date:01/14/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/09/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/09/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnnie L. Newsome N
Steven R. KiershNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Jock A. Banks YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NEWSOME, JOHNNIE L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 030288 ORDER: DENY APLT MO FOR NOTE - 01 FUNDS TO COMPLETE RT W/OUT NOTE - 02 PREJUDICE TO ITS RENEWAL NOTE - 02 BEFORE THE TR CT FOR ITS CONS NOTE - 03 IN THE FIRST INSTANCE; FO: NOTE - 03 COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO NOTE - 04 TAKE NEC STEPS TO CAUSE RT TO NOTE - 04 BE ORDERED & PREPARED FOR THE NOTE - 05 PURPOSE OF THIS APPEAL & FILE NOTE - 05 A STATE INDICATING SUCH W/THE NOTE - 06 CLERK OF THIS COURT. NOTE - 06
01/14/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPOINT) PANEL SCDATE 031687 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) STEVEN R. KIERSH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
04/09/1987FiledRecord Completed
01/29/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR FUNDS TO COMPLETE TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 06. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD M
03/07/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (687 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/08/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT INDICATING STEPS TAKEN TO ORDER TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD STATE
04/27/1988ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR LV TO FILE STATE, CLK TO FILE LDGD STATE; APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFT RT.EBP PANELPY SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD M
04/27/1988STATEMENT OF APLT IN RESPONSE TO 3/2/88 ORDER. PY PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (500 PGS - TREMEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 053088 SCHPRD RT
07/01/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE APLT BR OR VACATE APPNTMT & REFER TO BPR. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 061388 SCHPRD BA
07/08/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 21, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 071188 SCHPRD BA
07/22/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT; BRF OF APE DUE IN 30 DAYS.DAS PANELPY SCDATE 081088 SCHPRD X
08/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/10/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 091688 SCHPRD BE
08/31/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/10/88. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD CHECK
10/07/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/9/88 (NO OPA) MLR PANEL SCDATE 101088 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/9/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CHECK
11/09/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/09/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD BE
04/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELMKFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/21/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD