judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL E. MCDOWELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0070
Short Caption:DANIEL E. MCDOWELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8822-86Filed Date:01/14/1987

Opening Event Date:01/14/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDaniel E. Mcdowell N
Richard S. StolkerNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCDOWELL, DANIEL E. UNITED STATES
01/14/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/13/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - ATTY APPOINT) PANEL SCDATE 031687 SCHPRD R
03/31/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD S. STOLKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/13/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041087 SCHPRD DSA
03/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (32 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 121587 SCHPRD RT
08/12/1988ORDER APLT BR DUE IN 40 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 033188 SCHPRD RT
10/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 092188 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1988ORDER DENY MO TO DISMISS W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL IN 10 DAYS W/STATE IN ACCORD W/JOHNSON V. US. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 102588 SCHPRD N
01/13/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO RE-FILE MOTION TO DISMISS MLR PANEL SCDATE 012389 SCHPRD CHECK
01/13/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
02/10/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL MO TO DISMISS & CASE DISMISSED DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020789 SCHPRD Q
02/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
03/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD