Case Information: 42824 | |||
Short Caption: | LAPLANTE VS. WORLDWIDE ASSET | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A467177 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/16/2004 / Osko, Eugene | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2004 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Raleigh, Hunt & McGarry, P.C.--check no. 19320. | ||
02/20/2004 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 04-03342 | |
03/01/2004 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 04-03806 | |
03/10/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
03/16/2004 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. | ||
04/14/2004 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 04-06890 | |
04/14/2004 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 04-06891 | |
04/21/2004 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 04-07336 | |
04/21/2004 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |