judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARVIN TAYLOR V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0188
Short Caption:MARVIN TAYLOR V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead:87-CF-0188Consolidated: 87-CF-0482
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F557-86Filed Date:02/26/1987

Opening Event Date:02/26/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/01/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/17/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/28/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarvin Taylor N
Edward D. Joseph YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Barbara J. Valliere YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TAYLOR, MARVIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: BRYANT JONES NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 CON 87-482 & 87-227 NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 4/25/88 ORD: SS, 4/19/88 ORD NOTE - 03 VACATED TO EXTENT THAT 87-227 NOTE - 04 IS CONS W/PREVIOUSLY CONS NOS. NOTE - 04 87-188 & 87-482; CONS BRF OF NOTE - 05 APLT IN 87-188 & 87-482 DUE NOTE - 05 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETE REC IS NOTE - 06 FL. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 8/12/88 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 07 FOR APLT IN NOS. 87-188 & 87- NOTE - 08 482 TO W/D & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 08 WILLIAM L. PETERS, & APPT NOTE - 09 EDWARD D. JOSEPH FOR; NEWLY- NOTE - 09 APPTD COUNSEL TO FL STATE IN NOTE - 10 20 DAYS INDICATING STATUS OF NOTE - 10 PENDG RT ORDERED. NOTE - 11 10/7/88 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 11 STAY AND ALL PROCEEDINGS IN NOTE - 12 THIS APPEAL ARE HEREBY STAYED NOTE - 12 PDG DISPOSITION OF 23-110 MO. NOTE - 13 FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT. FO NOTE - 13 THAT CNSL FOR APLT W/I 30 DAYS NOTE - 14 TO ADVISE THIS COURT RE STATUS NOTE - 14 OF SAID MOTION. NOTE - 15 10/4/89 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 15 TO MOVE APLT BACK TO METRO NOTE - 16 AREA; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL NOTE - 16 A STATE IN 10 DAYS AS TO NOTE - 17 STATUS OF PENDG MO IN TRL CRT. NOTE - 17 NOTE - 18 01/03/90 ORD: FO EDWARD D. NOTE - 18 JOSEPH, ESQ. APTD. TO REPT NOTE - 19 APLT. DSA IN NO. 89-1466 SHALL NOTE - 19 BE FILED W/IN 10 DAYS NOTE - 20 CON: 87-482 & 89-1466 NOTE - 20 NOTE - 21 030990 ORD: GRANT APLT JONES NOTE - 21 MO TO VACATE STAY OF PROC; F/O NOTE - 22 APLTS BRFS DUE IN 40 DAYS, NOTE - 22 APLE'S BRF 30 DAYS THEREAFTER.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 90/12/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BROWNGA FOR - APPELLANT JONES ATTY 2 - JOSEPHE FOR - APLT TAYLOR ATTY 3 - VALLIEREB FOR - APPELLEE
01/01/1906 PETERSW VACATED 8/12/88.
02/26/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM L. PETERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB (NO SLIP SENT - PNDG DSA) PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD R
05/07/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/07/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 072787 SCHPRD BA
08/12/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (6 PGS. - KACZOROWSKI) PM PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/25/1987ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR, APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 070687 SCHPRD OPE
02/18/1988RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE, TO COURT-APPOINTED COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1988ORDER SS, CONS 87-188 & 87-482; FO: APLT BR DUE 40 DAYS AFTER RT HAS BEEN FILED W/THIS COURT. PANELPY SCDATE 100187 SCHPRD RT
04/25/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 03-06. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (76 PGS - FINNERIN) FILED IN 87-227 GT PANEL SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD RT
06/21/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 6/17/88, FROM AP- PELLANT, PRO SE, RE COURT-AP- POINTED ATTORNEY MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/24/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 062388 SCHPRD Q
07/22/1988COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IN 87-482 RJG PANEL SCDATE 070588 SCHPRD ANSA
08/12/1988APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EDWARD D. JOSEPH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD CHECK
08/29/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (17 PGS - WATKINS) JB PANEL SCDATE 081788 SCHPRD RT
09/01/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING ESTI- MATED COMPLETION DATE OF TRANSCRIPT JB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD STATE
09/07/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/07/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 14 SL PANELPY SCDATE 092988 SCHPRD N
11/07/1988STATEMENT OF APPELLANT REGARDING 23-110 MOTION PENDING IN LOWER COURT GT PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD STATE
12/01/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (20 PGS RT - RAMOS) GT PANEL SCDATE 113088 SCHPRD RT
12/01/1988RECORD COMPLETED
12/15/1988ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TAYLOR IN 10 DAYS TO FILE STATE RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRIAL CT. EBP PANELRO SCDATE 120188 SCHPRD CHECK
12/21/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 15TH COURT ORDER REGARDING STATUS OF TRIAL COURT PROCEEDINGS JB PANEL SCDATE 122788 SCHPRD STATE
01/13/1989ORDER THAT CNSL SHALL FILE COPY OF 23-110 MO FILED IN SUP.CT. WITH THIS CT W/I 20 DAYS SL PANELRO SCDATE 010489 SCHPRD N
01/25/1989RECEIVED COPY OF 23-110 MOTION FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT JB PANEL SCDATE 020289 SCHPRD CHECK
03/17/1989ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 87-188 & 87-482 TO FILE STATE RE: STAT OF 23-110 MO IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELRBH SCDATE 030189 SCHPRD CHECK
03/23/1989STATEMENT TO 3-17-89 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 072789 SCHPRD STATE
06/27/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 20 DAYS, TO FILE STATE RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOT IN TR CT. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/03/1989STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF SUPERIOR COURT PROCEEDINGS RJG PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD STATE
08/24/1989MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLT TO MOVE APLT BACK TO METROPOLITAN AREA AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989STATEMENT OF APLT TO STATUS OF 23-110 MO IN TRIAL CT AD PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD CHECK
10/04/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 15-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD OPE
10/13/1989STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF TRIAL CT PROCEEDINGS AD PANEL SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD STATE
12/08/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, ON OR BEF 1/7/90, TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF 23-110 MOT. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 87-188, 87- 482, & 89-1466 FOR ALL PURP; (SEE NOTE FIELDS 18 & 19) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/09/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 21-22. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD M
04/18/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041890 SCHPRD BA
05/23/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052290 SCHPRD BE
06/12/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 6/22/90. NFX JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 053190 SCHPRD B
06/22/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 28, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 062290 SCHPRD BE
06/28/1990RECEIVED APELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL LODGED BRF; FO THAT THESE APPEALS BE SCHD AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 071890 SCHPRD B
07/23/1990BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/17/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/17/1990ARGUED PANELTESTWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1992DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 603 A.2d 451
02/21/1992OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 0497
02/21/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI
03/05/1992APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING HE NEEDS ADEQUATE TM TO STUDY & RESPOND TO THE OPINION. PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1992ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM AND PET FOR REHEARING DUE W/I 14 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORD SL PANELRO SCDATE 031692 SCHPRD OPE
03/19/1992ORDER - that appeal no. 87-227 is hereby severed from appeal nos. 87-188, 87-482, and 89-1466, for the purpose of issuance of the mandate.
03/19/1992ORDER - that appeal no. 87-227 is hereby severed from appeal nos. 87-188, 87-482, and 89-1466, for the purpose of issuance of the mandate.
05/15/1992ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING (TESTWA)
05/28/1992MANDATE ISSUED
06/19/1992NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI Denied