judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NEBO, EUGENE EVAILIO THIEME, REINHOLD WILLIAM

Case Information: 86-CV-0177
Short Caption:NEBO, EUGENE EVAILIO THIEME, REINHOLD WILLIAMClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1521-84Filed Date:01/24/1986

Opening Event Date:01/24/1986Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/04/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/1988
Argued/Submitted:06/07/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/08/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
John S. Hale YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William R. Scanlin NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
William C.E. Robinson YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NEBO, EUGENE EVAILIO THIEME, REINHOLD WILLIAM
01/24/1986FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/08/1986ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DISMISSED. (NO CAS & FEE) EBP PANELPY SCDATE 021086 SCHPRD CAS
04/17/1986APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO OTSC RJG PANEL SCDATE 041886 SCHPRD ANSA
04/17/1986$50.00 DOCKETING FEE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1986RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1986$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/30/1986ORDER NO 7A; APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DR/SRT W/CLK OF SUP CT & SERVE CLK OF THIS CT AND APLE SL PANELPY SCDATE 042986 SCHPRD CHECK
05/09/1986DESIGNATION OF RECORD JB PANEL SCDATE 051286 SCHPRD DR
05/09/1986STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/29/1986RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) GG PANEL SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD R
11/04/1987FiledRecord Completed
11/04/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (322 PGS - MOORE) JB PANEL SCDATE 063086 SCHPRD RT
12/07/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 121487 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1988FiledBriefing Completed
01/04/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 010788 SCHPRD BE
06/07/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/07/1988SUBMITTED PANELPYSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELPYSTGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/08/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD