judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GIBSON, JR. (MELVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34775
Short Caption:GIBSON, JR. (MELVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9900631CClassification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/07/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/07/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-08351
09/08/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 21, 1999. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. 99-08458
09/15/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 8/9/99. Court Reporter: Christy Y. Hamrey. 99-08729
09/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Accompanying the documents required to be transmitted pursuant to NRAP 3(e) was a letter from the clerk that indicated "this is a sealed case pursuant to the nature of the charges involved." The materials forwarded to this court do not indicate that the district court entered an order sealing this matter. This matter shall remain unsealed. In preparing papers to be filed in this appeal, counsel should refrain from including or referring to information which is confidential. 99-08743
10/04/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Criminal Appeal. 99-09506
10/15/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-09995
10/15/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.