judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as Trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust

Case Heading (06-152)
Case Number:06-152Case Docketed On:06/29/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as Trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust
Full Title:COLORADO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a Colorado corporation, Petitioner, v. DONALD L. SAMMONS, individually and as Trustee of the Sammons Family Living Trust, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerColorado Casualty Insurance CompanyJohn Anthony Coppede
RespondentDonald L. SammonsJames W. Britt
Brooke Wunnicke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/29/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/29/2006Petition - Writ - review; received copy on diskPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
06/29/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/30/2006Event - Phone Call rom respondent re missing pages. Faxed due to holiday.EventPhone CallFinal
07/13/2006Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
07/14/2006Response/Objection - Petition for review (duplicate copy)Response/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
07/27/2006Order - Petition for review - denyOrderPetition for review - denyFinal
07/27/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal