judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FAOULY S. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-0877
Short Caption:FAOULY S. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL5606-95Filed Date:07/08/2010

Opening Event Date:07/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/09/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/10/2010
Argued/Submitted:04/05/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/20/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantFaouly S. Davis YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
07/23/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 8, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
08/09/2010RECORD INDEX
08/09/2010RECORD COPIES
08/09/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/11/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
09/10/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
09/10/2010APPENDIX TO APPELLANT'S BRIEF.
10/08/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until November 15, 2010
11/02/2010 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before November 15, 2010. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF
11/10/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
11/24/2010FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
03/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT and appointment of counsel (by LETTER- from aplt re: asking court to appoint counsel and oral argument)dwm
03/23/2011On consideration of the motion of pro se appellant requesting leave to present oral argument and appointment of counsel, and it appearing that this matter is scheduled on the Summary Calendar of April 5, 2011, it is ORDERED on behalf of the merits division assigned to condider this matter that the motion is denied and this matter shall be submitted for decision on April 5, 2011, without oral argument by either party, on the record and briefs alone. (JAC)
04/05/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/05/2011SUBMITTED to Glickman,Oberly,Schwelb.
05/26/2011AFFIRMED (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
06/20/2011MANDATE ISSUED