judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BENJAMIN BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0193
Short Caption:BENJAMIN BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10459-86Filed Date:02/25/1987

Opening Event Date:02/25/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:07/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBenjamin Brown N
John A. Briley, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
W. Mark Nebeker YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, BENJAMIN UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 3/2/88 ORD: GRANT JOINT MO TO NOTE - 01 SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT NOTE - 02 TO TRANSMIT DOCUMENT IN MO AS NOTE - 02 SUPP REC FORTHWITH;GRANT MO OF NOTE - 03 APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO NOTE - 03 3/3/88; NFX.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/07/06 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - BRILEYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - NEBEKERW FOR - APPELLEE
02/25/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
04/15/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN A. BRILEY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD R
04/27/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 042787 SCHPRD DSA
05/14/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (216 PGS - SALAZAR) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (18 PGS - SALAZAR) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT PB PANEL SCDATE 060887 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (4 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
09/02/1987FiledRecord Completed
09/02/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 23RD (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 101287 SCHPRD BA
10/22/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF OF APLT DUE IN 30 DAYS; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 102387 SCHPRD CHECK
11/23/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/15/1987APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1/21/88 (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 122387 SCHPRD BE
01/15/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 18TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD BE
01/20/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/18/88; NFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 011988 SCHPRD X
02/03/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (91 PGS - SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF BOTH PARTIES REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF RECORD MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MARCH 3RD (NO OPA) MLH PANEL SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD BE
02/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (PLEADINGS & TRANSCRIPT) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/24/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (TAPE) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1988ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 022488 SCHPRD X
03/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
03/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 030388 SCHPRD BE
03/04/1988$5 PAID TO DC TREASURER JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (23 PGS DAVIS - 51 PGS SALAZAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 040388 SCHPRD SR
06/06/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/08/1988LETTER GRANT REQ OF APLT FOR ORAL ARG ON SUM CAL OF 7/6/88. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD OPE
07/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/06/1988ARGUED PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEST SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/19/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
09/12/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/30/1990LETTER RETURNING EXHIBITS-- ONE BROWN LETTER SIZE ENVELOPE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD